Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 777 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6382 Week
» 17929 Month
» 417611 Year
» 494198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6023   06/1930

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1930 KING EDWARD II

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class King
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1930
Withdrawal During 06/1962
Service Life 32 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/05/1956
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 6023, name: KING EDWARD II
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6023    

prev prev