Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6024   06/1930

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1930 KING EDWARD I

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class King
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 06/1930
Withdrawal During 06/1962
Service Life 32 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 09/10/1954
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1930 To Service To service as GWR Number 6024, name: KING EDWARD I
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6024    

prev prev