Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1867 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19670 Week
» 72686 Month
» 192213 Year
» 3219066 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
21 |
m/e |
09/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8162 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68162 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Departmental |
21 |
m/e |
03/1956 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
Works Number |
8315 |
To Service |
During 09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1960 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/10/1930 |
Peterborough MPD (8P) |
The quoted date of closure of Peterborough (8P) as 1924 is too early. I should like to state that this date is much too early as I visited the shed on Sunday, 19th October, 1930 when it contained the following locos.-Kirtley 2-4-0 No. 21, 0-6-0 No. 2434, Johnson 2-4-0 Nos. 100/87, 0-6-0's 3358, 3602 and Class 4 0-6-0 4098/9, 4518-20. Although there were no L.N.W.R. locos. present on this occasion, ' Jumbos ' bearing 8P shed-plates were still to be seen at Rugby as late as 1928 (5018 Talavera, being noted by me in November, 1928). |
SLS/195806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 21 Built at Sentinel, Works Number 8315 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8162 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
10/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68162 |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
03/1956 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 21 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 21 |
|
|