Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
94 |
m/e |
10/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8179 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68179 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
Works Number |
8329 |
To Service |
During 10/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1951 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 94 Built at Sentinel, Works Number 8329 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8179 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68179 |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
17/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68179 |
|
|