Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 677 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19588 Week
» 84542 Month
» 287206 Year
» 3314059 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
86 |
m/e |
12/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8185 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68185 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Y3 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-0T |
Builder |
Sentinel |
Works Number |
8609 |
To Service |
During 12/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 19/04/1955 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 86 Built at Sentinel, Works Number 8609 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8185 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
03/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68185 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68185 |
|
|