|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 07/03/1922 | 12/05/1922 | 67 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/07/1925 | 25/02/1925 | -127 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 11/11/1926 | 20/01/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 22/02/1929 | 06/06/1929 | 105 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 30/05/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 50 days | General | Chimney dome & cab heights cut down |
||
Stratford Works | 12/03/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 210 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 07/05/1936 | 17/06/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/06/1937 | 16/07/1937 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 11/03/1939 | 23/06/1939 | 105 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 04/05/1941 | 13/06/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 235 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 234 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/10/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) Renumbered to BR 68125 |
||
Stratford Works | 22/09/1952 | 06/11/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 23973 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 05/09/1955 | 05/09/1955 | 1 day | NR |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 227 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1554 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 40 boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1922. Dep: 12/05/1922. | ||
25/02/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7227 | ||
03/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1925. Dep: 25/02/1925. | ||
11/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1926. Dep: 20/01/1927. | ||
22/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1929. Dep: 06/06/1929. | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. Work undertaken: Chimney dome & cab heights cut down |
||
12/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 210 (Diagram 40) |
||
07/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1936. Dep: 17/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
20/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1937. Dep: 16/07/1937. | ||
11/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1939. Dep: 23/06/1939. | ||
04/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1941. Dep: 13/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 235 (Diagram 40) |
||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8125 | ||
16/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 234 (Diagram 40) |
||
11/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) Renumbered to BR 68125 |
||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 06/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 23973 (Diagram 40) |
||
05/09/1955 | Works Visit | |||
19/09/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68125 from Stratford (30A) |