|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 24/05/1922 | 02/09/1922 | 102 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 11/03/1924 | 02/07/1924 | 114 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7226 |
||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1926 | 28/10/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/10/1928 | 11/01/1929 | 85 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/01/1931 | 23/04/1931 | 111 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 27/06/1935 | 30/07/1935 | 34 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 26/04/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 47 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 01/04/1940 | 19/04/1940 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 07/06/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/12/1944 | 19/01/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 235 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/01/1947 | 05/03/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/04/1949 | 17/05/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) Renumbered to BR 68127 |
||
Stratford Works | 25/10/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 23971 (Diagram 40) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/12/1953 | 30/01/1954 | 45 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 226 Built at Stratford Works, Works Number 1583 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 40 boiler fitted |
||
24/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922. | ||
11/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1924. Dep: 02/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 7226 |
||
19/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1926. Dep: 28/10/1926. | ||
19/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1928. Dep: 11/01/1929. | ||
03/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1931. Dep: 23/04/1931. | ||
27/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1935. Dep: 30/07/1935. | ||
26/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. | ||
01/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1940. Dep: 19/04/1940. | ||
07/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 233 (Diagram 40) |
||
10/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1944. Dep: 19/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 235 (Diagram 40) |
||
26/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8127 | ||
28/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1947. Dep: 05/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 230 (Diagram 40) |
||
01/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1949. Dep: 17/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 231 (Diagram 40) Renumbered to BR 68127 |
||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 23971 (Diagram 40) |
||
17/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954. | ||
23/04/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68127 from Stratford (30A) |