08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 116 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1884 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 93 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/04/1916 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43 |
|
|
1921 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: 24/05/1921. |
|
|
1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: ?/1923. Dep: 13/12/1923. |
|
|
1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6843
|
|
|
1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1925. Dep: 25/05/1925. |
|
|
08/07/1932 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1932. Dep: ?/01/1933. |
|
|
09/1935 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: ?/09/1935. Dep: ?/10/1935. |
|
|
1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. |
|
|
30/03/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. |
|
|
16/11/1940 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 07/12/1940. |
|
|
07/00/1941 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/00/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. |
|
|
1943 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. |
|
|
1946 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. |
|
|
22/09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8190 |
|
|
13/05/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 68190
|
|
|
02/05/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 13/06/1950. |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
14/07/1955 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
27/08/1955 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
04/04/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
07/12/1956 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
15/07/1957 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
25/05/1958 |
To Store |
To Store at Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
28/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68190 from Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|