Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 830 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5801 Week
» 20378 Month
» 383623 Year
» 460210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6100 02/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2102/12/1958
2912/1967
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L79
Works Number 27681
To Service 02/12/1958
Withdrawn 06/10/1971
Time in Service 12 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 02/12/1958
65A Eastfield w/e 30/04/1960
   Withdrawn 06/10/1971

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/07/1959 Uprated to 1,100 h.p.
12/1967 Fitted with Paxman Ventura rated at 1,350 h.p.
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/12/1958 To Service To service as D6100
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27681
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
18/07/1959 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
24/10/1965 Sightings St Rollox shed: Stored at St Rollox shed RCTS 12/1965 Link
12/1967 Modification Modification: Fitted with Paxman Ventura rated at 1,350 h.p.    
27/08/1968 Sightings Dundee depot: Around the area - On the shed RO 12/1968 Link
10/09/1968 Sightings D1974 ran low on fuel while working the 10:20 Edinburgh - Aberdeen at barry Links. D6100 in blue took over for the rest of the run. RO 11/1968  
09/08/1969 Sightings On Eastfield shed. - BR blue livery. Rail Blue  
06/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D6100    
01/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow    

prev