Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 890 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6495 Week
» 18042 Month
» 417724 Year
» 494311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6106   05/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 61xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1931
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Service Life 34 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1953
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/03/1963
82C Swindon 4w/e 25/01/1964
85A Worcester 4w/e 20/07/1964
82C Swindon 5w/e 24/08/1964
81E Didcot w/e 08/11/1964
81C Southall 2w/e 10/01/1965
81F Oxford 6w/e 19/09/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1953
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/03/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 82C Swindon 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 81E Didcot 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 04/01/1965
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 19/09/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1931 To Service To service as GWR Number 6106
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 6106    

prev prev