Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 708 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19619 Week
» 84573 Month
» 287237 Year
» 3314090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6117 |
16/06/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/06/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/07/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
|
22/06/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
14/05/1964 |
30/05/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
17 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
24/11/1964 |
27/11/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
4 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/04/1965 |
29/04/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
18/08/1965 |
25/09/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
39 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
24/03/1967 |
14/04/1967 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
22 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6117 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27847 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 22/06/1963. |
|
|
14/05/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1964. Dep: 30/05/1964. |
|
|
24/11/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1964. Dep: 27/11/1964. |
|
|
27/04/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1965. Dep: 29/04/1965. |
|
|
18/08/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1965. Dep: 25/09/1965. |
|
|
24/03/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1967. Dep: 14/04/1967. |
|
|
16/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6117 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|