Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6119 |
30/06/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
30/06/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/12/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
31/05/1961 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
03/09/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
17/07/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6119 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27849 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/12/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6119 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|