Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1723 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25354 Week
» 90308 Month
» 292972 Year
» 3319825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6121 |
18/08/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
18/08/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/02/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6121 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27851 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 21 to 29 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6121 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|