Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3042 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16448 Week
» 69464 Month
» 188991 Year
» 3215844 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6125 |
29/09/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
29/09/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/01/1961 |
Unknown |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
08/02/1961 |
Unknown |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
05/01/1960 |
13/01/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
375 days |
|
14,237 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
22/01/1962 |
31/01/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
10 days |
|
57,984 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
08/01/1964 |
20/01/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
13 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6125 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27855 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
05/01/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
22/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 31/01/1962. |
|
|
08/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1964. Dep: 20/01/1964. |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6125 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |
|
|