Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3235 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16641 Week
» 69657 Month
» 189184 Year
» 3216037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6136 |
17/12/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
17/12/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/07/1962 |
Severe |
Traction motor cabling, flexible air bellows damaged. Also, fairings and other parts of body distorted by heat. |
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Air brake had been left applied at Perth, causing overheating of brake blocks and sparking which ignited oily deposits near traction motor cabling. Had been working in conjunction with D6130 on 11:00 Relief Aberdeen to Balloch |
Forteviot |
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
05/01/1961 |
12/01/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
8 days |
|
23,143 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
27/09/1961 |
28/09/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
51,569 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
16/07/1962 |
18/08/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
34 days |
|
93,212 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
20/03/1963 |
06/04/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
18 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
15/09/1964 |
17/09/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
26/10/1964 |
14/11/1964 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
20 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
29/12/1964 |
26/02/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
60 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
28/05/1965 |
15/06/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
21/09/1965 |
16/10/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
26 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/10/1965 |
31/12/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
73 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
18/03/1967 |
07/04/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
21 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
14/04/1967 |
02/05/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6136 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27866 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
10/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
17/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1961. Dep: 12/01/1961. |
|
|
27/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. |
|
|
16/07/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1962. Dep: 18/08/1962. |
|
|
20/03/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1963. Dep: 06/04/1963. |
|
|
15/09/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1964. Dep: 17/09/1964. |
|
|
26/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1964. Dep: 14/11/1964. |
|
|
29/12/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1964. Dep: 26/02/1965. |
|
|
28/05/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1965. Dep: 15/06/1965. |
|
|
21/09/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1965. Dep: 16/10/1965. |
|
|
20/10/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1965. Dep: 31/12/1965. |
|
|
18/03/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1967. Dep: 07/04/1967. |
|
|
14/04/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1967. Dep: 02/05/1967. |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6136 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |
|
|