Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 775 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2890 Week
» 25396 Month
» 328586 Year
» 1550151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6138 02/02/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2102/02/1960
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27942
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 1
Multiple Fitting Red Circle
To Service 02/02/1960 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
GNP: All over Brunswick Green including front of cab 02/02/1960

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 02/02/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
07/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
02/02/1961 Unknown   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
31/08/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Works Visits
Works Date Stopped Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Notes Mileage
Inverurie Works 16/08/1961 16/08/1961 21/08/1961 6 days Not Classified     43,674
Inverurie Works 05/12/1961 05/12/1961 15/12/1961 11 days Not Classified     57,589
Inverurie Works 03/07/1962 03/07/1962 13/07/1962 11 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 19/07/1962 19/07/1962 21/08/1962 34 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 03/09/1962 03/09/1962 27/09/1962 25 days Heavy Casual    
Inverurie Works 08/10/1962 08/10/1962 10/10/1962 3 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 21/01/1963 21/01/1963 22/02/1963 33 days Heavy Casual    
Inverurie Works 05/04/1963 05/04/1963 14/06/1963 71 days Heavy Casual    
Inverurie Works 14/01/1964 14/01/1964 13/03/1964 60 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 11/06/1964 11/06/1964 1 day Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 21/10/1965 21/10/1965 04/12/1965 45 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 18/01/1966 18/01/1966 15/02/1966 29 days Intermediate    
Inverurie Works 11/08/1966 11/08/1966 18/08/1966 8 days Unclassified    

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1960 To Service To service as D6138
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27942
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
07/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
16/08/1961 21/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 16/08/1961. Dep: 21/08/1961.    
05/12/1961 15/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 05/12/1961. Dep: 15/12/1961.    
03/07/1962 13/07/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1962. Dep: 13/07/1962.    
19/07/1962 21/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1962. Dep: 21/08/1962.    
03/09/1962 27/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 27/09/1962.    
08/10/1962 10/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1962. Dep: 10/10/1962.    
21/01/1963 22/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1963. Dep: 22/02/1963.    
05/04/1963 14/06/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1963. Dep: 14/06/1963.    
14/01/1964 13/03/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1964. Dep: 13/03/1964.    
11/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1964.    
21/10/1965 04/12/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1965. Dep: 04/12/1965.    
18/01/1966 15/02/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1966. Dep: 15/02/1966.    
11/08/1966 18/08/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1966. Dep: 18/08/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6138    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
20/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev