Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2298 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15704 Week
» 68720 Month
» 188247 Year
» 3215100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6139 |
16/02/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/02/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/04/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
11/12/1961 |
22/12/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
12 days |
|
72,107 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
14/03/1963 |
03/04/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
21 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
08/05/1963 |
22/05/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
15 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
08/10/1963 |
07/02/1964 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
123 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/02/1964 |
|
Unclassified |
|
|
|
1 day |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/05/1965 |
18/06/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
30 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
26/07/1965 |
13/08/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
21/10/1965 |
01/11/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
12 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
11/11/1965 |
26/11/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
16 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
03/05/1966 |
21/05/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
19 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
25/08/1966 |
27/08/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6139 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27943 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
11/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 11/12/1961. Dep: 22/12/1961. |
|
|
14/03/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1963. Dep: 03/04/1963. |
|
|
08/05/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1963. Dep: 22/05/1963. |
|
|
08/10/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1963. Dep: 07/02/1964. |
|
|
20/02/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1964. |
|
|
20/05/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1965. Dep: 18/06/1965. |
|
|
26/07/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1965. Dep: 13/08/1965. |
|
|
21/10/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1965. Dep: 01/11/1965. |
|
|
11/11/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1965. Dep: 26/11/1965. |
|
|
03/05/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1966. Dep: 21/05/1966. |
|
|
25/08/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1966. Dep: 27/08/1966. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6139 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|