Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2549 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15955 Week
» 68971 Month
» 188498 Year
» 3215351 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6140 |
24/02/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/02/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/06/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
15/11/1961 |
20/11/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
66,394 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
26/12/1961 |
16/01/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
22 days |
|
73,614 |
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
16/03/1962 |
23/06/1962 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
100 days |
|
82,462 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
10/07/1963 |
20/08/1963 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
42 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
02/12/1963 |
|
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
1 day |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/10/1964 |
23/10/1964 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/01/1965 |
11/02/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
24 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
25/02/1966 |
08/03/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
12 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/06/1966 |
04/07/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
8 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
24/06/1967 |
08/07/1967 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
15 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6140 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27944 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
07/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
15/11/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 20/11/1961. |
|
|
26/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 26/12/1961. Dep: 16/01/1962. |
|
|
16/03/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1962. Dep: 23/06/1962. |
|
|
10/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1963. Dep: 20/08/1963. |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1963. |
|
|
19/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1964. Dep: 23/10/1964. |
|
|
19/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1965. Dep: 11/02/1965. |
|
|
25/02/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1966. Dep: 08/03/1966. |
|
|
27/06/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1966. Dep: 04/07/1966. |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1967. Dep: 08/07/1967. |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6140 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|