Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 792 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2907 Week
» 25413 Month
» 328603 Year
» 1550168 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6142 22/03/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2122/03/1960
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27946
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 1
Multiple Fitting Red Circle
To Service 22/03/1960 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
GNP: All over Brunswick Green including front of cab 22/03/1960

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 22/03/1960
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 02/07/1960
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 30/07/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.        


Works Visits
Works Date Stopped Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Notes Mileage
Inverurie Works 15/05/1961 15/05/1961 25/05/1961 11 days Not Classified     36,434
Inverurie Works 06/11/1961 06/11/1961 25/11/1961 20 days Not Classified     55,356
Inverurie Works 03/01/1962 03/01/1962 04/01/1962 2 days Not Classified     60,230
Inverurie Works 05/06/1962 05/06/1962 31/12/1962 210 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 05/12/1963   Heavy Casual    
Inverurie Works 23/03/1964 23/03/1964 19/06/1964 89 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 30/06/1964 30/06/1964 01/07/1964 2 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 02/09/1964 02/09/1964 08/09/1964 7 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 16/03/1965 16/03/1965 20/03/1965 5 days Light Repair    
Inverurie Works 15/06/1965 15/06/1965 24/06/1965 10 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 07/02/1966 07/02/1966 19/03/1966 41 days Intermediate    
St. Rollox Works 07/08/1967 07/08/1967 08/08/1967 2 days Unclassified    

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1960 To Service To service as D6142
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27946
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
15/05/1961 25/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961.    
06/11/1961 25/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 06/11/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961.    
03/01/1962 04/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 03/01/1962. Dep: 04/01/1962.    
05/06/1962 31/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 31/12/1962.    
05/12/1963 05/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 05/12/1963.    
23/03/1964 19/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1964. Dep: 19/06/1964.    
30/06/1964 01/07/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1964. Dep: 01/07/1964.    
02/09/1964 08/09/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1964. Dep: 08/09/1964.    
16/03/1965 20/03/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1965. Dep: 20/03/1965.    
15/06/1965 24/06/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1965. Dep: 24/06/1965.    
07/1965 Sightings Fraserburgh - Aberdeen. Green livery with rectangular yellow panels. John Williamson  
15/10/1965 Sightings D6142 and D6145 worked the very last Royal Train from Ballater to Aberdeen John Williamson  
07/02/1966 19/03/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1966. Dep: 19/03/1966.    
07/08/1967 08/08/1967 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1967. Dep: 08/08/1967.
Reason: Bogies
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6142    
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev