Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6143 |
30/03/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
30/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
17/01/1962 |
27/01/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
11 days |
|
74,912 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
15/07/1963 |
16/08/1963 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
33 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/02/1964 |
20/03/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
28 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
02/06/1964 |
|
Unclassified |
|
|
|
1 day |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
21/06/1964 |
26/06/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/08/1964 |
24/08/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
05/01/1965 |
06/01/1965 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
28/01/1965 |
01/02/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/03/1965 |
26/03/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6143 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27947 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
17/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 17/01/1962. Dep: 27/01/1962. |
|
|
15/07/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/07/1963. Dep: 16/08/1963. |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1964. Dep: 20/03/1964. |
|
|
02/06/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1964. |
|
|
21/06/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1964. Dep: 26/06/1964. |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1964. Dep: 24/08/1964. |
|
|
05/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1965. Dep: 06/01/1965. |
|
|
28/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1965. Dep: 01/02/1965. |
|
|
22/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1965. Dep: 26/03/1965. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6143 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge |
|
|