Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 507 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6261 Week
» 34219 Month
» 68861 Year
» 1290426 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6144 05/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27948
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/04/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 05/04/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 12/12/1960 26/01/1961 46 days Not Classified   21,746
Inverurie Works 22/08/1961 1 day Not Classified   46,513
Inverurie Works 19/02/1962 20/03/1962 30 days Light Casual   76,080
Inverurie Works 23/05/1962 30/11/1962 192 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 07/08/1963 06/09/1963 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 20/03/1964 03/06/1964 76 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 03/03/1965 07/04/1965 36 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 28/03/1966 02/04/1966 6 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/04/1960 To Service To service as D6144
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27948
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
12/12/1960 26/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 26/01/1961.    
22/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 22/08/1961.    
19/02/1962 20/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1962. Dep: 20/03/1962.    
23/05/1962 30/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 30/11/1962.    
07/08/1963 06/09/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/08/1963. Dep: 06/09/1963.    
20/03/1964 03/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1964. Dep: 03/06/1964.    
03/03/1965 07/04/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1965. Dep: 07/04/1965.    
28/03/1966 02/04/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1966. Dep: 02/04/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6144    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
13/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev