Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2282 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20085 Week
» 73101 Month
» 192628 Year
» 3219481 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6144 |
05/04/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/04/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
12/12/1960 |
26/01/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
46 days |
|
21,746 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/08/1961 |
|
Not Classified |
|
|
|
1 day |
|
46,513 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/02/1962 |
20/03/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
30 days |
|
76,080 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
23/05/1962 |
30/11/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
192 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
07/08/1963 |
06/09/1963 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
31 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/03/1964 |
03/06/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
76 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
03/03/1965 |
07/04/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
36 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
28/03/1966 |
02/04/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6144 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27948 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
12/12/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 26/01/1961. |
|
|
22/08/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 22/08/1961. |
|
|
19/02/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1962. Dep: 20/03/1962. |
|
|
23/05/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 30/11/1962. |
|
|
07/08/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/08/1963. Dep: 06/09/1963. |
|
|
20/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1964. Dep: 03/06/1964. |
|
|
03/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1965. Dep: 07/04/1965. |
|
|
28/03/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1966. Dep: 02/04/1966. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6144 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|