Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 157 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 33869 Month
» 68511 Year
» 1290076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6145 15/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27949
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/04/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 15/04/1960
63A Perth South 4w/e 04/06/1960
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 02/07/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 29/01/1962 13/02/1962 16 days Not Classified   26,680
Inverurie Works 19/08/1963 30/08/1963 12 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 25/11/1963 11/12/1963 17 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 11/03/1964 15/05/1964 66 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 24/08/1965 09/10/1965 47 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 21/01/1966 25/01/1966 5 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 30/12/1966 05/01/1967 7 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/04/1960 To Service To service as D6145
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27949
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
07/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
29/01/1962 13/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 13/02/1962.    
19/08/1963 30/08/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 30/08/1963.    
25/11/1963 11/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1963. Dep: 11/12/1963.    
11/03/1964 15/05/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1964. Dep: 15/05/1964.    
07/1965 Sightings Aberdeen - Fraserburgh. All over green with small yellow panels. John Williamson  
24/08/1965 09/10/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1965. Dep: 09/10/1965.    
15/10/1965 Sightings D6142 and D6145 worked the very last Royal Train from Ballater to Aberdeen John Williamson  
21/01/1966 25/01/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1966. Dep: 25/01/1966.    
30/12/1966 05/01/1967 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1966. Dep: 05/01/1967.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6145    
14/04/1968 Sightings Perth depot visit: Stored at Perth depot with works plates removed RCTS 6/1968 Link
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
01/06/1968 Sightings Perth depot: Dumped RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev