Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 876 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 25497 Month
» 328687 Year
» 1550252 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6146 29/04/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2129/04/1960
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27950
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 1
Multiple Fitting Red Circle
To Service 29/04/1960 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 09/1968
Cut At Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Information This locomotive was involved in a collision in April 1965 and sent to Inverurie Works. It is believed that it never left Inverurie and was scrapped in the autumn of 1968, contrary to contemporary reports.
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
GNP: All over Brunswick Green including front of cab 29/04/1960

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 29/04/1960
60A Inverness 4w/e 04/06/1960
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 02/07/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn on 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
07/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.        


Works Visits
Works Date Stopped Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Notes Mileage
Inverurie Works 23/08/1961 23/08/1961 24/08/1961 2 days Not Classified     41,793
Inverurie Works 07/11/1961 07/11/1961 11/11/1961 5 days Not Classified     52,883
Inverurie Works 22/08/1962 22/08/1962 24/08/1962 3 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 05/04/1963 05/04/1963 15/04/1963 11 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 10/07/1963 10/07/1963 19/07/1963 10 days Light Casual    
Inverurie Works 14/01/1964 14/01/1964 1 day Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 06/02/1964 06/02/1964 18/02/1964 13 days Unclassified    
Inverurie Works 14/04/1964 14/04/1964 20/04/1964 7 days Light Repair    

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1960 To Service To service as D6146
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27950
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
04/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
07/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
23/08/1961 24/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 23/08/1961. Dep: 24/08/1961.    
07/11/1961 11/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 07/11/1961. Dep: 11/11/1961.    
22/08/1962 24/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1962. Dep: 24/08/1962.    
05/04/1963 15/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1963. Dep: 15/04/1963.    
10/07/1963 19/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1963. Dep: 19/07/1963.    
14/01/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1964.    
06/02/1964 18/02/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1964. Dep: 18/02/1964.    
14/04/1964 20/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1964. Dep: 20/04/1964.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6146    
15/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Derelict shell in the yard RO 10/1968 Link
28/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Dumped at station end of works yard RO 11/1968 Link
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev