Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 964 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14370 Week
» 67386 Month
» 186913 Year
» 3213766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6147 |
05/05/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/05/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/06/1961 |
29/06/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
34,887 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/07/1961 |
21/07/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
38,377 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
25/12/1961 |
26/12/1961 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
63,200 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
|
16/11/1962 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/08/1963 |
21/11/1963 |
Light Repair |
|
|
|
87 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
18/08/1964 |
20/08/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
11/02/1965 |
05/03/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
23 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
05/07/1965 |
09/08/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
36 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
08/11/1965 |
12/11/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
5 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
23/11/1965 |
04/01/1966 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
43 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
07/09/1966 |
16/09/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
10 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6147 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27951 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
07/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
27/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 27/06/1961. Dep: 29/06/1961. |
|
|
20/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 20/07/1961. Dep: 21/07/1961. |
|
|
25/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 25/12/1961. Dep: 26/12/1961. |
|
|
16/11/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 16/11/1962. |
|
|
27/08/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1963. Dep: 21/11/1963. |
|
|
18/08/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1964. Dep: 20/08/1964. |
|
|
11/02/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1965. Dep: 05/03/1965. |
|
|
05/07/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1965. Dep: 09/08/1965. |
|
|
08/11/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1965. Dep: 12/11/1965. |
|
|
23/11/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1965. Dep: 04/01/1966. |
|
|
07/09/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1966. Dep: 16/09/1966. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6147 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|