Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 156 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5910 Week
» 33868 Month
» 68510 Year
» 1290075 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6148 15/05/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27952
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/05/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 15/05/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 06/07/1961 07/07/1961 2 days Not Classified   35,643
Inverurie Works 14/07/1961 17/07/1961 4 days Light Casual   37,259
Inverurie Works 20/07/1961 21/07/1961 2 days Not Classified   37,259
Inverurie Works 06/10/1961 03/11/1961 29 days Light Casual   55,080
St. Rollox Works 02/12/1961 11/01/1962 41 days Light Casual   17,633
Inverurie Works 04/05/1962 09/05/1962 6 days Light Casual   79,022
Inverurie Works 25/05/1962 06/06/1962 13 days Light Casual   81,765
Inverurie Works 19/08/1963 03/10/1963 46 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 20/02/1964 10/04/1964 51 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 21/09/1964 28/09/1964 8 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 17/11/1964 20/11/1964 4 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 09/09/1965 15/11/1965 68 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 08/08/1966 11/08/1966 4 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1960 To Service To service as D6148
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27952
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
07/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
06/07/1961 07/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 06/07/1961. Dep: 07/07/1961.    
14/07/1961 17/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/07/1961. Dep: 17/07/1961.    
20/07/1961 21/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 20/07/1961. Dep: 21/07/1961.    
06/10/1961 03/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1961. Dep: 03/11/1961.    
02/12/1961 11/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1961. Dep: 11/01/1962.    
04/05/1962 09/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1962. Dep: 09/05/1962.    
25/05/1962 06/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962.    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop SLS 7/1962 Link
19/08/1963 03/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 03/10/1963.    
20/02/1964 10/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1964. Dep: 10/04/1964.    
21/09/1964 28/09/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1964. Dep: 28/09/1964.    
17/11/1964 20/11/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1964. Dep: 20/11/1964.    
09/09/1965 15/11/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1965. Dep: 15/11/1965.    
08/08/1966 11/08/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1966. Dep: 11/08/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6148    
14/04/1968 Sightings Perth depot visit: Stored at Perth depot with works plates removed RCTS 6/1968 Link
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
01/06/1968 Sightings Perth depot: Dumped RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev