Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 513 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6267 Week
» 34225 Month
» 68867 Year
» 1290432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6149 30/05/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27953
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/05/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs , 7 mths
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 30/05/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 27/05/1961 29/05/1961 3 days Not Classified   28,723
St. Rollox Works 23/08/1961 01/12/1961 101 days Heavy Casual   48,639
Inverurie Works 23/01/1962 02/02/1962 11 days Not Classified   50,989
Inverurie Works 26/03/1962 23/05/1962 59 days Not Classified   59,323
Inverurie Works 02/09/1963 18/10/1963 47 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 06/08/1964 07/08/1964 2 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 17/02/1965 12/03/1965 24 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 16/08/1965 19/08/1965 4 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 01/04/1966 15/04/1966 15 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 08/08/1966 11/08/1966 4 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1960 To Service To service as D6149
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27953
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
27/05/1961 29/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 27/05/1961. Dep: 29/05/1961.    
23/08/1961 01/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961.    
23/01/1962 02/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 02/02/1962.    
26/03/1962 23/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 26/03/1962. Dep: 23/05/1962.    
02/09/1963 18/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1963. Dep: 18/10/1963.    
06/08/1964 07/08/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1964. Dep: 07/08/1964.    
17/02/1965 12/03/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/02/1965. Dep: 12/03/1965.    
16/08/1965 19/08/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1965. Dep: 19/08/1965.    
01/04/1966 15/04/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1966. Dep: 15/04/1966.    
08/08/1966 11/08/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1966. Dep: 11/08/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6149    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
16/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev