Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1740 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15146 Week
» 68162 Month
» 187689 Year
» 3214542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6149 |
on |
05/01/1933 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
61xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
278 |
To Service |
Mon 05/01/1933 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
w/e |
14/08/1963 |
ALLOC |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/01/1933 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6149 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6149 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|