Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 156 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5910 Week
» 33868 Month
» 68510 Year
» 1290075 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6150 06/06/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27954
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/06/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 06/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 06/06/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
St. Rollox Works 13/04/1961 06/06/1961 55 days Heavy Casual   30,288
Inverurie Works 01/09/1961 05/10/1961 35 days Not Classified   43,181
Inverurie Works 19/02/1963 28/02/1963 10 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 02/05/1963 07/06/1963 37 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 20/06/1963 12/07/1963 23 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 31/07/1963 12/09/1963 44 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 08/01/1964 1 day Light Repair  
Inverurie Works 06/03/1964 21/04/1964 47 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 27/05/1964 1 day Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 09/02/1965 11/02/1965 3 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 17/11/1965 09/12/1965 23 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 04/02/1966 09/02/1966 6 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 10/03/1966 26/03/1966 17 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 27/04/1966 16/05/1966 20 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 25/05/1966 03/06/1966 10 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 05/12/1966 23/12/1966 19 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1960 To Service To service as D6150
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27954
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
13/04/1961 06/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1961. Dep: 06/06/1961.    
01/09/1961 05/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 05/10/1961.    
19/02/1963 28/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1963. Dep: 28/02/1963.    
02/05/1963 07/06/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1963. Dep: 07/06/1963.    
20/06/1963 12/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1963. Dep: 12/07/1963.    
31/07/1963 12/09/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1963. Dep: 12/09/1963.    
08/01/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1964.    
06/03/1964 21/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1964. Dep: 21/04/1964.    
27/05/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1964.    
09/02/1965 11/02/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1965. Dep: 11/02/1965.    
17/11/1965 09/12/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1965. Dep: 09/12/1965.    
04/02/1966 09/02/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1966. Dep: 09/02/1966.    
10/03/1966 26/03/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1966. Dep: 26/03/1966.    
27/04/1966 16/05/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1966. Dep: 16/05/1966.    
25/05/1966 03/06/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1966. Dep: 03/06/1966.    
05/12/1966 23/12/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1966. Dep: 23/12/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6150    
14/04/1968 Sightings Thornton Junction: Dumped at Thornton Jct. RCTS 6/1968 Link
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up in the scrapyard - arrived today. RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev