Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 180 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5934 Week
» 33892 Month
» 68534 Year
» 1290099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6151 13/06/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27955
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/06/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 13/06/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 27/05/1961 29/05/1961 3 days Not Classified   26,754
Inverurie Works 20/07/1961 21/07/1961 2 days Light Casual   33,841
Inverurie Works 31/08/1962 03/09/1962 4 days Not Classified  
Inverurie Works 04/10/1962 19/10/1962 16 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 13/11/1962 10/05/1963 179 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 14/11/1963 21/02/1964 100 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 29/06/1964 01/07/1964 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1960 To Service To service as D6151
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27955
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
27/05/1961 29/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 27/05/1961. Dep: 29/05/1961.    
20/07/1961 21/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1961. Dep: 21/07/1961.    
31/08/1962 03/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 31/08/1962. Dep: 03/09/1962.    
04/10/1962 19/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1962. Dep: 19/10/1962.    
13/11/1962 10/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 10/05/1963.    
14/11/1963 21/02/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1963. Dep: 21/02/1964.    
29/06/1964 01/07/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1964. Dep: 01/07/1964.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6151    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
13/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev