Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6152 |
24/06/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
24/06/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
22/01/1962 |
23/01/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
66,318 |
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
16/10/1962 |
06/11/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
22 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
17/12/1962 |
18/12/1962 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
07/02/1963 |
22/02/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
16 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
13/12/1963 |
|
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
1 day |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
11/05/1964 |
09/10/1964 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
152 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
13/01/1965 |
18/01/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
16/09/1965 |
13/11/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
59 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
20/02/1967 |
22/02/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
03/07/1967 |
15/07/1967 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
13 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6152 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27956 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
22/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962. |
|
|
16/10/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 16/10/1962. Dep: 06/11/1962. |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 17/12/1962. Dep: 18/12/1962. |
|
|
07/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1963. Dep: 22/02/1963. |
|
|
13/12/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1963. |
|
|
11/05/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1964. Dep: 09/10/1964. |
|
|
13/01/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1965. Dep: 18/01/1965. |
|
|
16/09/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/09/1965. Dep: 13/11/1965. |
|
|
20/02/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1967. Dep: 22/02/1967. |
|
|
03/07/1967 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1967. Dep: 15/07/1967. |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
16/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6152 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
02/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|