Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4211 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17617 Week
» 70633 Month
» 190160 Year
» 3217013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6153 |
06/07/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
06/07/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1960 |
|
Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
03/01/1963 |
04/01/1963 |
Not Classified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/03/1963 |
21/03/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
27/09/1963 |
31/01/1964 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
127 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
05/02/1964 |
06/02/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
19/03/1964 |
20/03/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
2 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
05/05/1964 |
12/06/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
39 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
15/10/1964 |
29/10/1964 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
15 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
11/12/1964 |
08/01/1965 |
Intermediate |
|
|
|
29 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
18/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
10 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
01/09/1965 |
03/09/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
3 days |
|
|
|
Inverurie Works |
|
n/a |
09/06/1966 |
14/06/1966 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
6 days |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6153 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27957 Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p. |
|
|
03/01/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 03/01/1963. Dep: 04/01/1963. |
|
|
19/03/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1963. Dep: 21/03/1963. |
|
|
27/09/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1963. Dep: 31/01/1964. |
|
|
05/02/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1964. Dep: 06/02/1964. |
|
|
19/03/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1964. Dep: 20/03/1964. |
|
|
05/05/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1964. Dep: 12/06/1964. |
|
|
15/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1964. Dep: 29/10/1964. |
|
|
11/12/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1964. Dep: 08/01/1965. |
|
|
18/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1965. Dep: 27/03/1965. |
|
|
01/09/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1965. Dep: 03/09/1965. |
|
|
09/06/1966 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1966. Dep: 14/06/1966. |
|
|
24/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6153 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|