Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 583 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 583 Week
» 20228 Month
» 54870 Year
» 1276435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6154 14/07/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27958
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/07/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 5 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 14/07/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
24/09/1960   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
14/01/1964 Unknown   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 22/05/1961 25/05/1961 4 days Not Classified   30,828
Inverurie Works 02/06/1961 12/06/1961 11 days Not Classified   31,998
Inverurie Works 10/05/1962 11/05/1962 2 days Light Casual   77,249
Inverurie Works 18/05/1962 12/06/1962 26 days Not Classified   80,743
Inverurie Works 22/10/1962 01/11/1962 11 days Not Classified  
Inverurie Works 26/09/1963 27/12/1963 93 days Heavy Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 26/05/1964 28/05/1964 3 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 11/03/1965 22/05/1965 73 days Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 09/03/1966 16/03/1966 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/07/1960 To Service To service as D6154
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27958
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
24/09/1960 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
22/05/1961 25/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 22/05/1961. Dep: 25/05/1961.    
02/06/1961 12/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 02/06/1961. Dep: 12/06/1961.    
10/05/1962 11/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1962. Dep: 11/05/1962.    
18/05/1962 12/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 18/05/1962. Dep: 12/06/1962.    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop SLS 7/1962 Link
22/10/1962 01/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Not Classified) - Arr: 22/10/1962. Dep: 01/11/1962.    
26/09/1963 27/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 27/12/1963.    
14/01/1964 Sightings Caught fire (train heating boiler, electrical insulation failure) CD&E #9  
26/05/1964 28/05/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1964. Dep: 28/05/1964.    
11/03/1965 22/05/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1965. Dep: 22/05/1965.    
09/03/1966 16/03/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1966. Dep: 16/03/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6154    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
13/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev