Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 514 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6268 Week
» 34226 Month
» 68868 Year
» 1290433 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6156 15/09/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 21
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L94
Works Number 27960
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/09/1960
Withdrawn 30/12/1967 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 3 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 15/09/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/09/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/03/1961   Uprated to 1,100 h.p.  


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Inverurie Works 24/11/1961 05/12/1961 12 days Light Casual   52,440
Inverurie Works 21/03/1962 24/03/1962 4 days Light Casual   63,395
Inverurie Works 21/01/1963 25/01/1963 5 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 26/12/1963 27/12/1963 2 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 04/09/1964   Intermediate  
Inverurie Works 24/10/1964 02/11/1964 10 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 08/01/1965 15/01/1965 8 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 31/03/1965 15/04/1965 16 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 01/09/1965 15/11/1965 76 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 25/07/1966 29/07/1966 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1960 To Service To service as D6156
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27960
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
11/03/1961 Modification Modification: Uprated to 1,100 h.p.    
24/11/1961 05/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/11/1961. Dep: 05/12/1961.    
21/03/1962 24/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1962. Dep: 24/03/1962.    
21/01/1963 25/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1963. Dep: 25/01/1963.    
26/12/1963 27/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/12/1963. Dep: 27/12/1963.    
04/09/1964 04/09/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Intermediate) - Dep: 04/09/1964.    
24/10/1964 02/11/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1964. Dep: 02/11/1964.    
08/01/1965 15/01/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1965. Dep: 15/01/1965.    
31/03/1965 15/04/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1965. Dep: 15/04/1965.    
01/09/1965 15/11/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1965. Dep: 15/11/1965.    
25/07/1966 29/07/1966 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1966. Dep: 29/07/1966.    
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D6156    
14/04/1968 Sightings Scrapped at McWilliams, Shettleston. Cab laying on the floor - green with yellow warning panels    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
23/05/1968 Sightings Scrap convoy: Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston RO 7/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Cabs only RO 7/1968 Link
02/06/1968 Sightings McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston: Dumped - Cabs only RO 7/1968 Link

prev prev