Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 764 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5338 Week
» 33296 Month
» 67938 Year
» 1289503 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 6300 m/e 11/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 211
Works Number 2800
To Service During 11/1920
Withdrawal During 06/1960
Service Life 39 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24 Birkenhead Mollington Street 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
81C Southall 3w/e 17/05/1952
83E St Blazey 4w/e 21/02/1953
83F Truro 4w/e 06/10/1956
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   m/e 30/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as GWR Number 6300
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2800
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (24)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6300    

prev prev