Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 65 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6111 Week
» 25756 Month
» 60398 Year
» 1281963 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 6313 m/e 01/1921

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 211
Works Number 2813
To Service During 01/1921
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Service Life 40 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
44 Banbury 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
81E Didcot 4w/e 16/05/1953
81C Southall 4w/e 03/11/1956
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OXF Oxford 4w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   m/e 30/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1943 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as GWR Number 6313
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2813
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (44)    
10/1943 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 6313    

prev prev