Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1617 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19420 Week
» 72436 Month
» 191963 Year
» 3218816 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6320 |
23/03/1960 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
LISTER |
01/1967 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
23/03/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/09/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
29/12/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6320 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27893 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
01/1967 |
Naming |
Named 'LISTER' |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6320 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|