Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1155 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14561 Week
» 67577 Month
» 187104 Year
» 3213957 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6322 |
07/04/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/04/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/01/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6322 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27895 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6322 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|