Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 913 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18716 Week
» 71732 Month
» 191259 Year
» 3218112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
6325 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
212 |
Works Number |
2825 |
To Service |
During 03/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/11/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1950 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6325 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2825 |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southall (SHL) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
23/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6325 |
|
|