Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3164 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16570 Week
» 69586 Month
» 189113 Year
» 3215966 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6326 |
16/05/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/05/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6326 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27899 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6326 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|