Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17178 Week
» 70194 Month
» 189721 Year
» 3216574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6331 |
26/07/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
26/07/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6331 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27904 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6331 from Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|