Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 106 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1140 Week
» 23646 Month
» 326836 Year
» 1548401 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6342 m/e 03/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2887
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Mon 17/09/1962
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1923
134 Shrewsbury on 01/01/1934
84E Tyseley 8w/e 11/07/1953
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 25/01/1958
89A Oswestry 4w/e 01/11/1958
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 03/12/1960
   Withdrawn on 17/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 84G Kidderminster 4w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1947 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. SLS/194708
23/04/1961 Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 822 (receiving repairs and newly fitted with (i) Beyer Peacock Works Plate dated 1902 but without works number, and (ii) Plate indicating W & L No. 1.), 823, 1013, 1619, 5774, 6342, 8498, 9017, 46512. SLS/196106
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6342
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2887
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (134)    
05/1947 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
17/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6342    

prev prev