Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 78 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1112 Week
» 23618 Month
» 326808 Year
» 1548373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6343 m/e 03/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2888
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Wed 21/09/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1923
22 Bristol Bath Road on 01/01/1934
   Withdrawn on 21/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TN Taunton 4w/e 01/11/1947
WDN   m/e 30/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1951 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos 1367, 1446, 2165, 2229/36, 2385, 2809/84/98, 3778, 3832/40/59, 4075/82, 4519/28/73/85, 4698, 4965/77/88, 5077, 5191, 5261, 5306, 5403, 5805, 5904/15/43, 6157, 6343/78, 6439, 6637, 6702, 6818/25/33/46/55, 7006, 7218, 7318, 7727, 7812, 8764/87, 9312/17, 9706/81;
New work: Nos. 7014 BRD and 7015 SDN, both are painted G.W.R. green, as is No. 7016; the construction Of Nos. 4160-79 and 7430-39 is under way. During W/E 24/7 Nos. 5023, 6009 an 6910 were ex Works after having been in for the new British Railways' crest to be placed on the tenders, while during W/E 31/7 No. 5954 was ex general repair, having been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey together with the new crest on the tender. During W/E 14/8 Nos. 7016 Chester Castle CDF and 7430 STB were completed; No. 8393 also entered Works during this week.
It is understood that the next batch of 'Castle's' (Nos. 7018-27) has been cancelled. Works' pilots lately have been and are: Nos. 906, 1758, 1900 an 2751; The following locomotives came in for cutting-up during W/E 24/7: Nos. 2680, 3002/27, 4386, 5127 an 5349
SLS/194809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6343
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2888
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (22)    
02/1951 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
21/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6343    

prev prev