Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 123 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1157 Week
» 23663 Month
» 326853 Year
» 1548418 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6349 m/e 05/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2894
To Service During 05/1923
Withdrawal Mon 10/08/1964
Service Life 41 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1923
136 Severn Tunnel Junction on 01/01/1934
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 29/11/1952
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/12/1960
87F Llanelly 4w/e 16/06/1962
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 10/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HFD Hereford 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1957 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6349
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2894
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Severn Tunnel Junction (136)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/1957 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
10/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6349    

prev prev