Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2049 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19852 Week
» 72868 Month
» 192395 Year
» 3219248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6350 |
27/06/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
27/06/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6350 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27923 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6350 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|