Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 78 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1112 Week
» 23618 Month
» 326808 Year
» 1548373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6350 m/e 05/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2895
To Service During 05/1923
Withdrawal Mon 06/01/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1923
54 Chester West on 01/01/1934
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/11/1958
81E Didcot 4w/e 12/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 06/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/12/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 12/08/1961
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1948 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6350
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2895
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester West (54)    
02/1948 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
06/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 6350    

prev prev