Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 141 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7882 Week
» 28324 Month
» 365170 Year
» 1586735 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6351 m/e 05/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2896
To Service During 05/1923
Withdrawal Mon 21/11/1960
Service Life 37 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1923
77 Fishguard Goodwick on 01/01/1934
WES Westbury 4w/e 18/05/1946
BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 05/11/1949
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/03/1954
   Withdrawn on 21/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/03/1954
WDN   on 21/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6351
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2896
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fishguard Goodwick (77)    
18/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (WES)    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
21/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 6351    

prev prev