Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 78 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1112 Week
» 23618 Month
» 326808 Year
» 1548373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6355 m/e 10/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2900
To Service During 10/1923
Withdrawal Mon 02/03/1959
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1923
22 Bristol Bath Road on 01/01/1934
87D Swansea East Dock 3w/e 19/05/1951
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
84B Oxley 4w/e 30/01/1954
84C Banbury 4w/e 08/09/1956
82C Swindon 4w/e 03/11/1956
87F Llanelly 4w/e 22/03/1958
87H Neyland 4w/e 09/08/1958
   Withdrawn on 02/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 84B Oxley 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   m/e 31/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1952 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6355
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2900
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (22)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
05/1952 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
02/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 6355    

prev prev