Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 72 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1106 Week
» 23612 Month
» 326802 Year
» 1548367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 6358 m/e 11/1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 216
Works Number 2903
To Service During 11/1923
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1959
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1923
215 Worcester on 01/01/1934
82D Westbury 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn on 12/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   m/e 31/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1951 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1923 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 6358
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2903
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (215)    
03/1951 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
12/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 6358    

prev prev