Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 227 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 227 Week
» 34802 Month
» 104281 Year
» 1325846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 6408 m/e 04/1932

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 64xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1932
Withdrawal During 02/1962
Scrapping During 07/1962
Service Life 29 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 25/01/1958
82D Westbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 05/09/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 18/06/1960
86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 10/09/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1932 To Service To service as GWR Number 6408
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F)    
02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 6408    
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link

prev prev